CO HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning funding for carrying out duties related to the office of public guardianship, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Public Guardianship Operation Conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1045
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1045_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1045_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1045_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1045_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1045_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/df4eeaa1170b5363872583a100718e8a-hb19-1045-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/df4eeaa1170b5363872583a100718e8a-hb19-1045-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1d803fe5e47191fb872583de004ae521-hb19-1045-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1d803fe5e47191fb872583de004ae521-hb19-1045-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1d803fe5e47191fb872583de004ae521-hb19-1045-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1045vote56a1a4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab9a125e78c34868872583e400791c63-hb19-1045-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4b3fc20c81377caa872583e900117438-hb19-1045-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0ab1eca9b19d680872583e9007ef372-hb19-1045-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0ab1eca9b19d680872583e9007ef372-hb19-1045-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1045vote55de5b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1045vote7f97a5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1045vote7facb2

Bill Comments

feedback