CO HB1045 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Entrance Fee State Parks
Title
Veterans Entrance Fee State Parks
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Larry Crowder [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1045 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-02-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-26 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |