CO HB1044 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the selection of members of vacancy committees by central committees.
Title
Vacancy Committee Selection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |