CO HB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning advance behavioral health orders determining the scope of treatment an adult wishes to receive under certain behavioral health circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advance Behavioral Health Orders Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.013) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-02-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019
2019-02-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-01-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1044
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1044_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/76a9af6f130914008725838b005eed6a-hb19-1044-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1044vote65f449
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ce3045c34b2c04d872583a80074381f-hb19-1044-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ce3045c34b2c04d872583a80074381f-hb19-1044-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ce3045c34b2c04d872583a80074381f-hb19-1044-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1044vote59bfc1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1044vote59e0f8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1044vote6a9774
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1044vote6a86f3

Bill Comments

feedback