CO HB1044 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the "Colorado Children's Trust Fund Act".
Title
Colorado Children's Trust Fund Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1044 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1044 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1044 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1044 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |