CO HB1043 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Felony Offense For Repeat DUI Offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony Offense For Repeat DUI Offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Fianance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
2015-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2015-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-25HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043fin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A75F41EF2AF63A8D87257D90007813CD/$FILE/1043_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/962C163889D04D3D87257DE400112D3C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EF4ADB93883924A687257DE4001088BF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7E534B7CAD78517D87257DE4001055A0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/840044243BEB70DB87257E13007C228D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5A05E3EFEBB8AC687257E13007C110E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A8E9BA8149088FC087257E13007BC492
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/54FE448B30B6E11587257E13007BE2E9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D11833D5E0A3815787257E23004C2288
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/60C10592929AA55887257E23004C173D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/58559227EA11595387257E350061AF9D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3CFC350954A8F8A287257E370070BE44
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/94663A02A219038687257E38004E9CE0

Bill Comments

feedback