CO HB1043 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana
Title
Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.007 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented on their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance | |
2011-04-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance + Appropriations | |
2011-04-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |