CO HB1040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorizing the interception of communication relating to a crime of human trafficking.
Title
Interception Of Human Trafficking Communications
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Lundeen [R] | Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1040 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1040 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/06/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |