CO HB1039 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning identity documents for transgender persons, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identity Documents For Transgender Persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1039, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.009) (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 20 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Signed
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-22SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-19SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-18SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1039
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1039_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7299a1c3e958bd07872583990071cdfe-hb19-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7299a1c3e958bd07872583990071cdfe-hb19-1039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote6789e7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote5c7532
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote5c2cc6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote5c90a4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b041eca2af4c07db872583bc00733c6c-hb19-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b041eca2af4c07db872583bc00733c6c-hb19-1039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f899738b433d2c9e872583da004b1c35-hb19-1039-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f899738b433d2c9e872583da004b1c35-hb19-1039-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote55c9de
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote181c62
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1039vote183680

Bill Comments

feedback