CO HB1039 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Give-back For Institutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Give-back For Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13HouseGovernor Signed
2015-03-03HouseSent to the Governor
2015-03-03HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-02-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-01-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-01-23HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-01-20HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB3E8C49F459CE0187257DA200626633/$FILE/1039_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EC54D04F82D65CDA87257DD3007A11EC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B411507365C95EA587257DD3007A6CC8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EC54D04F82D65CDA87257DD3007A11EC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B411507365C95EA587257DD3007A6CC8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/04A7B67FA05B383A87257DEA007203E6

Bill Comments

feedback