CO HB1038 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning dental services for pregnant women covered under the children's basic health plan, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Services For Pregnant Women On Children's Basic Health Plan Plus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1038 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1038 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1038, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-02-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1038
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1038_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f0471d4fef4915ad8725838b00652714-hb19-1038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f0471d4fef4915ad8725838b00652714-hb19-1038-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/92addaf9076f6a0f872583a90052c82d-hb19-1038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1038vote5fd7fe
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0781d0cab22cc73d872583bc005dfe6e-hb19-1038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ecfe0b7940df3064872583cc004d60ef-hb19-1038-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1038vote53ab15
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/92addaf9076f6a0f872583a90052c82d-hb19-1038-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback