CO HB1038 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning establishing a continuing education requirement for professional land surveyors.
Title
Land Surveyors Continuing Education Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1038 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1038 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1038 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1038, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |