CO HB1037 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Colorado water conservation board's authority to augment stream flows with acquired water rights that have been previously decreed for augmentation use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Augmentation Of Instream Flows

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-02-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-02-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1037
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1037_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1037_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1037_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1037_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1037_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/daf9818f55703ec4872584f8005d8af7-hb20-1037-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/daf9818f55703ec4872584f8005d8af7-hb20-1037-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1037vote5aeed8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82364821bf4a4d6f8725851400772c87-hb20-1037-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82364821bf4a4d6f8725851400772c87-hb20-1037-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1037vote5aaa0a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1037vote5d719d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1037vote5d8ea5

Bill Comments

feedback