CO HB1037 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Classify Certain Ag Products Wholesale Sales
Title
Classify Certain Ag Products Wholesale Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamend - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamend - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1037, unamended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1037, unamended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamend - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamend - CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1037, unamended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1037, unamended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Orders - Passed | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy + Finance + Appropriations | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-05 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-30 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |