CO HB1036 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures designed to encourage the use of nontoxic bullets for hunting, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Nontoxic Bullet Replacement Hunting Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1036 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1036 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 16 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1036 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1036 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 16 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1036, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1036, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |