CO HB1035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an increase in the flexibility to set fees for electrical inspections that are not conducted by the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remove Fee Cap Electrical Inspection Local Government Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10 Governor Signed
2019-04-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-22SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-20SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/22/2019
2019-03-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-01-31HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1035
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1035_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/28b86b6a0b1b5ace8725838b0070d734-hb19-1035-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1035vote5a4db7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/28b86b6a0b1b5ace8725838b0070d734-hb19-1035-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6008464b21a3ab6d872583bd00810ef9-hb19-1035-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1035vote55d034
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1035vote595261
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1035vote5964ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6008464b21a3ab6d872583bd00810ef9-hb19-1035-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback