CO HB1033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a local government's authority to regulate products containing nicotine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Governments May Regulate Nicotine Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1033 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-18 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-02-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019
2019-02-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-21SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-01HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1033
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1033_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd0b6364d8d628728725839400712623-hb19-1033-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1033vote5ab70f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab38c787b92398ba872583a1007452b0-hb19-1033-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd0b6364d8d628728725839400712623-hb19-1033-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd0b6364d8d628728725839400712623-hb19-1033-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1033vote5ec875
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1033vote697d99
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1033vote696863

Bill Comments

feedback