CO HB1033 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Screening Brief Intervention Referral
Title
Screening Brief Intervention Referral
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations | |
2010-04-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-09 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-22 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations |