CO HB1029 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of an elected county officer to elect to receive a lower salary than the amount provided for by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow County Officers To Accept Lower Salary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Joint - CC_HB20-1029_2020A: Adopt the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 20-1029. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-06SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2020-06-05 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2020-03-13SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2020-03-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-02-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1029
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1029_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a97548b22871460872585040071205c-hb20-1029-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote59eda3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a97548b22871460872585040071205c-hb20-1029-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f1bcca5d9ee7e0687258522005eff9c-hb20-1029-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote54da4d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote568b50
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote5f8a45
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote5f9dba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote5c4c8b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1029vote5c2fa0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8486bb7baacc7fac8725857e004ea7ac-hb20-1029-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback