CO HB1028 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the preparation by the division of housing within the department of local affairs of an annual public report that provides information on money administered by the state to promote the provision of affordable housing, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annual Public Report Affordable Housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Recede (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1028 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Adherence - Result was to Recede
2021-06-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere
2021-05-25SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-20SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2021-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-10HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1028
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1028_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1028_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1028_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1028_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1028_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1028_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1028_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1028_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2e5b904ab7483d9872586940070f649-hb21-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2e5b904ab7483d9872586940070f649-hb21-1028-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2e5b904ab7483d9872586940070f649-hb21-1028-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6450083384e508e0872586c5004dfe17-hb21-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6450083384e508e0872586c5004dfe17-hb21-1028-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1028vote55529b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace6a554187fbde5872586d2007bd159-hb21-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a951b513b4726753872586da004d5704-hb21-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a951b513b4726753872586da004d5704-hb21-1028-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1028vote5dc7b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1028vote7520f0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1028vote11c028
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1028vote11d233

Bill Comments 750

feedback