CO HB1024 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the state's net operating loss deduction.
Title
Net Operating Loss Deduction Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |