CO HB1024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive relocation of laws pertaining to the commission on family medicine.
Title
Nonsubstantive Relocation Commission On Family Medicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1024 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1024 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2017-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |