CO HB1022 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of parties through the enforcement of proper surrogacy agreements.
Title
Surrogacy Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-16 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |