CO HB1021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supporting the peer support professional workforce, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Peer Support Professionals Behavioral Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1021 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1021 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |