CO HB1020 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Testing Evidence Of Sexual Assault
Title
Testing Evidence Of Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt strike-below amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to replace all instances of "sixty" with "ninety" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003, page 3, line 12, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to remove the word "medical" on page 1 lines 9 and 33, page 2, lines 9, 28, 29, and 40, page 3, lines 10, 17, 20, and 23. The chair ruled the amendment out of order. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt strike-below amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to replace all instances of "sixty" with "ninety" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003, page 3, line 12, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to remove the word "medical" on page 1 lines 9 and 33, page 2, lines 9, 28, 29, and 40, page 3, lines 10, 17, 20, and 23. The chair ruled the amendment out of order. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt strike-below amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to replace all instances of "sixty" with "ninety" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003, page 3, line 12, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to remove the word "medical" on page 1 lines 9 and 33, page 2, lines 9, 28, 29, and 40, page 3, lines 10, 17, 20, and 23. The chair ruled the amendment out of order. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt strike-below amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to replace all instances of "sixty" with "ninety" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003, page 3, line 12, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to remove the word "medical" on page 1 lines 9 and 33, page 2, lines 9, 28, 29, and 40, page 3, lines 10, 17, 20, and 23. The chair ruled the amendment out of order. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |