CO HB1020 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - House Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - House Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Subcontractor Notice For Mechanics' Lien
Title
Subcontractor Notice For Mechanics' Lien
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1020 indefinitely, at the sponsor's request (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1020 indefinitely, at the sponsor's request (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1020 indefinitely, at the sponsor's request (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1020 indefinitely, at the sponsor's request (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1020 indefinitely, at the sponsor's request (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1020, as amended, to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | House Committee on Legislative Council Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to Legislative Council | |
2011-02-15 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Committee Vote - Final Action Failed | |
2011-02-08 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development + Legislative Council |