CO HB1019 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the regulations of factory-built structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modification To Regulations Of Factory-built Structures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1019 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Governor Signed
2021-04-30 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-30HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-16SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1019
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1019_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1019_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1019_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1019_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/890f18380daf4bf5872586a10076dec8-hb21-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1019vote5dcc57
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ee2b41f15886537a872586b5006cba78-hb21-1019-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/890f18380daf4bf5872586a10076dec8-hb21-1019-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/890f18380daf4bf5872586a10076dec8-hb21-1019-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1019vote59c27a

Bill Comments 750

feedback