CO HB1018 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extension of the authorization for a regional transportation authority to seek voter approval for a uniform mill levy on all taxable property within its territory.
Title
Extend Voter Approval Window For RTA Regional Transportation Authority Mill Levy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1018 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1018 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1018 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1018 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-25 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |