CO HB1017 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing access to school social workers in public elementary schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Kindergarten Through Fifth Grade Social And Emotional Health Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.018) (Y: 26 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 27 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.018) (Y: 26 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 27 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-14 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |