CO HB1016 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Procurement Technical Assistance Program
Title
Procurement Technical Assistance Program
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Kevin Grantham [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1016, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-21 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |