CO HB1015 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the recreation of the Colorado water institute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreation Of The Colorado Water Institute

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20 Governor Signed
2019-02-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-31SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-01-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 01/23/2019 - No Amendments
2019-01-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-14HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1015
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1015_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fa41bcd80204400872583820070c2b7-hb19-1015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fa41bcd80204400872583820070c2b7-hb19-1015-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1015vote59cad5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5ecb24ea3620df14872583930071e737-hb19-1015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1015vote5c1b2a

Bill Comments

feedback