CO HB1015 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interstate Compact EMS Providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Compact EMS Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1015 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1015 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1015 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08HouseGovernor Signed
2015-04-28HouseSent to the Governor
2015-04-28HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-20SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-11SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-17HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-27HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015pubhe_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8B80FA2F25841E787257DB10065D225/$FILE/1015_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/982EEE60504D24DA87257DDA00749EA5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AE3971A5882753FA87257DDA00748EBD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DB5CE78246A9CB4787257DE4005655CF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AE3971A5882753FA87257DDA00748EBD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/982EEE60504D24DA87257DDA00749EA5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/17602F48EE7C1C7587257E05007151F6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A9F28CFB7DEC895487257E2A004BDB0A

Bill Comments

feedback