CO HB1013 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to regulate the use of restrictive practices on individuals in correctional facilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use Of Restrictive Practices In Prisons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Judiciary: Amend amendment L.002, page 9, line 29, strike the second "and" and substitute "of". (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05 Governor Signed
2023-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2023-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-04-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2023-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-01-31HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1013
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_rn3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1013_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/9C13D0F23E2CB34C87258947006CC39D/HB1013_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/45150D21AC58BDB987258995007537E0/HB1013_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/B5BA8DF6A07C85AB872589A3000C85BD/HB1013_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_r3.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1013_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b01f0a28a525c78e8725894800710672-hb23-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b01f0a28a525c78e8725894800710672-hb23-1013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b01f0a28a525c78e8725894800710672-hb23-1013-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c86d5fbea9ca458987258998004e612d-hb23-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c86d5fbea9ca458987258998004e612d-hb23-1013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1013vote644992
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a7a6f8f21505cae7872589a2007cb5dc-hb23-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09cf1e65a60c3d00872589a3004e83cd-hb23-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09cf1e65a60c3d00872589a3004e83cd-hb23-1013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1013vote599237
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1013vote19f783
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1013vote1a0723

Bill Comments

feedback