CO HB1013 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To School Finance Admin
Title
Modifications To School Finance Admin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2010-04-16 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-15 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |