CO HB1012 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning expansion of the prescription drug monitoring program to track information regarding all prescription drugs prescribed in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1012 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.011) (Y: 19 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1012 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1012 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1012, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1012, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-17SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-10HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1012
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_rr8.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1012_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1012_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_r4.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_r5.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1012_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e3d81febe50385872586a2006b7002-hb21-1012-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e3d81febe50385872586a2006b7002-hb21-1012-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e3d81febe50385872586a2006b7002-hb21-1012-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e3d81febe50385872586a2006b7002-hb21-1012-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bd40726a119e6d0f872586ae006cd3c0-hb21-1012-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4ac3673cddd56768872586ce00532955-hb21-1012-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote66dd99
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote62dbba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d445d815b42eaa10872586d80074546d-hb21-1012-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fab7a557697d5019872586e10052d9a4-hb21-1012-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fab7a557697d5019872586e10052d9a4-hb21-1012-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fab7a557697d5019872586e10052d9a4-hb21-1012-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote595451
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote58da4b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote176e2e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1012vote177fd4

Bill Comments

feedback