CO HB1011 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the establishment of a state grant program that provides funding to local governments that dedicate resources for wildfire mitigation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildfire Mitigation Incentives For Local Governments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Refer (2nd) (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1011, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-03 Governor Signed
2022-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2022-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2022-05-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2022-05-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2022-05-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2022-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2022-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2022-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2022-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2022-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Re-referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
2022-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Re-referred to House Committee of the Whole - No Amendments
2022-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2022-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2022-02-17HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2022-01-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb22-1011
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_en3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_en4.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/2022a_1011_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2022A/amendments/HB1011_L.006.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2022A/bills/fn/2022a_hb1011_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/269bb5ba8a29843e872587ec00788b50-hb22-1011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/269bb5ba8a29843e872587ec00788b50-hb22-1011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c2bb5d42a27cbb08725883200505481-hb22-1011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c2bb5d42a27cbb08725883200505481-hb22-1011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3c2bb5d42a27cbb08725883200505481-hb22-1011-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote5c607e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote5601ab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a6a38c6054eedf88725883a004d8ded-hb22-1011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a6a38c6054eedf88725883a004d8ded-hb22-1011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote029429
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote02fd0a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote1e0d73
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb22-1011vote1e2729

Bill Comments

feedback