CO HB1010 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the "Colorado Accurate Residence for Redistricting Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Accurate Residence For Redistricting Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1010 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1010, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1010, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-30HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1010
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1010_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1010_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1010_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb470d9b2257046c872584ff007e1ba4-hb20-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1010vote5d6da8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb470d9b2257046c872584ff007e1ba4-hb20-1010-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb470d9b2257046c872584ff007e1ba4-hb20-1010-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb470d9b2257046c872584ff007e1ba4-hb20-1010-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c9d162e661507d45872585130071044a-hb20-1010-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback