CO HB1009 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning suppressing court records of eviction proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suppressing Court Records Of Eviction Proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1009 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1009, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-01-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1009
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1009_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ed53de9dd4146c25872584f80077adde-hb20-1009-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ed53de9dd4146c25872584f80077adde-hb20-1009-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1009vote5e0842
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1009vote5ab7fb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d39caf53c702bc0f8725851a007cb6ef-hb20-1009-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1009vote59eaf8

Bill Comments

feedback