CO HB1008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-12)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-12)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increased options for financing forest health projects, and, in connection therewith, financing wildfire mitigation treatments.
Title
Forest Health Project Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1008 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1008 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water + Finance |