CO HB1008 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning protections for consumers who participate in health care cost-sharing arrangements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Cost-sharing Consumer Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1008
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1008_01.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/22dd22214f368e818725851300747937-hb20-1008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/22dd22214f368e818725851300747937-hb20-1008-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/22dd22214f368e818725851300747937-hb20-1008-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/22dd22214f368e818725851300747937-hb20-1008-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c4e0b6c5f0101118725851c0052bd37-hb20-1008-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c4e0b6c5f0101118725851c0052bd37-hb20-1008-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback