CO HB1005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of the health care services reserve corps task force, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Health Care Services Reserve Corps Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1005 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1005 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1005, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |