CO HB1004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-14)
Status: Passed on January 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-14)
Status: Passed on January 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the "Colorado Uniform Electronic Wills Act".
Title
Colorado Uniform Electronic Wills Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1004 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1004 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-01-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-01-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-01-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-13 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |