CO HB1004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a statewide policy for awarding college credit for military education and training.
Title
College Credit For Military Education And Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-09 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |