CO HB1003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a strategic action plan to address teacher shortages in Colorado.
Title
Strategic Plan To Address Teacher Shortages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1003, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |