CO HB1002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the income tax credit for child care expenses paid by a resident individual with a federal adjusted gross income of twenty-five thousand dollars or less.
Title
Child Care Expenses Income Tax Credit Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |