CO HB1001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a family and medical leave insurance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMLI Family Medical Leave Insurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1001 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1001 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment H] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2018-04-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-09HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/16/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1001
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1001_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1001_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1001_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-02-06t133328z-hb18-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-02-06t133328z-hb18-1001-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-02-06t133328z-hb18-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-07t115045z-hb18-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1001vote597410
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-hb18-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-30t143845z-hb18-1001-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback