CO HB1001 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Contr Certify Compliance With Equal Pay Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Contr Certify Compliance With Equal Pay Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1001 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) to L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2016-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-03-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2016-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2D4AFF48F4FCB787257F240063F8CE?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2D4AFF48F4FCB787257F240063F8CE/$FILE/1001_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2D4AFF48F4FCB787257F240063F8CE/$FILE/1001bus_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2D4AFF48F4FCB787257F240063F8CE/$FILE/1001_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2D4AFF48F4FCB787257F240063F8CE/$FILE/1001_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2BA1CE345E16D53E87257F79006C118A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/932D581EC9FA6F4F87257F800055C23B/$FILE/Ma24.pdf#563
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4CC0A6EDDF8AFFC987257F79006BB04F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0305BF4BF440D56887257F79006BCCDC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6CBB278F18DF419E87257F86007478DC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/47DFCDE1B9529F9F87257F860074CDDC

Bill Comments

feedback