CO HB1001 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Credit For Prop Destroyed By A Natural Cause

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credit For Prop Destroyed By A Natural Cause

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Motion to adopt the reengrossed version of House Bill 14-1001, with Amendments L.017 and L.018 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Motion to adopt the reengrossed version of House Bill 14-1001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - j001 The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-17HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-14HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-07HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2014-05-07HouseSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2014-05-07HouseFirst Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
2014-05-07HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2014-05-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2014-05-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2014-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-04-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2014-04-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001fin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001pp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001sfin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C914FB5B009B132A87257C5500667E2A/$FILE/1001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/07C9DF63A27AAD3987257C99007E2CA6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/07C9DF63A27AAD3987257C99007E2CA6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AA67164C99FDFEF887257C99007BE9DF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/845CE7F2319FD25787257C99007BE1D6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C8A519203B5868E87257C99007BA50E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4424659509EB424087257C99007B85F2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2E613C50D8ADE9AF87257C99007BC8E1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/134EEE37A0F2472E87257C99007BB8AA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/012F3E450FAABBD687257C99007E24F4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EB68137A6292436487257CAE004C6539
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A5D7D8C618D1577987257CAE004A7ADE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/837163935E6FAA6387257CAE004C5FDB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6240DACD29EAF32087257CAE004E856B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5C02506B1A3DEE3787257CAE004F3707
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F474D1606E9D541E87257CC2007569DE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CED04CE5F2F1283687257CC200753447
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DA035DB5757BE9CC87257CC9004E1CE3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA2BFEDEC143266687257CD1006F4D0B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/331B9F3E7845170687257CD1007064B3

Bill Comments

feedback