CO HB1001 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rule Review Evaluation Of Educator Effectiveness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rule Review Evaluation Of Educator Effectiveness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - House Bill 12-1001 to the Committee of the Whole as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - House Bill 12-1001 to the Committee of the Whole as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-15 Governor Action - Signed
2012-02-14 Sent to the Governor
2012-02-14 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-02-14 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-02-14 Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
2012-02-13 Senate Second Reading Passed
2012-02-08 Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-02-01 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2012-01-30 House Third Reading Passed
2012-01-27 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-01-26 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-01-23 House Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-01-11 Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001-LegSer_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7DA622E1E23231E387257981007F53B2/$FILE/1001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F5C2775FDA70B2258725798E006B5628
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B94698498F322BD18725798E006B4B6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/57C58113FDFED9E48725799E006B60CF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F5C2775FDA70B2258725798E006B5628
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B94698498F322BD18725798E006B4B6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/57C58113FDFED9E48725799E006B60CF

Bill Comments

feedback