CA SB1077 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 3090) of Division 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with former Section 3100) of Division 2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: road usage charge pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1077 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1077 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1077 DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-04SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2014-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4873.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 29.)
2014-08-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 6412.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-21AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
2014-08-06AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-08-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 23).
2014-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-06-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3599.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-12SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2014-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2014-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2014-04-01SenateHearing postponed by committee.
2014-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2014-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code3090Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1077&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140421_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140616_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140625_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140804_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140821_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140828_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_bill_20140929_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140429_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140512_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140527_0239PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140623_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140814_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140825_0335PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1077_vote_20140826_0733PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback